U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Probioferm, LLC v. Fluid Air, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.