U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02055
  • Case Name: Buljic et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Stay]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Expedite]
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 18, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 09, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
  • August 19, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 18, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.