U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Hartwig v. JDP, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2022: [Certificate]
  • April 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Closing Documents]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Substitute Party]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2021: [Witness List]
  • March 24, 2021: [Bifurcate/Sever]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 17, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • February 02, 2021: [Statement]
  • February 01, 2021: [Statement]
  • February 01, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 01, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 01, 2021: [Trial Brief]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 18, 2021: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • January 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 08, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 31, 2020: [In Limine]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.