U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Babcock v. Babcock
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 01, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Transcript]
  • November 17, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • November 10, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Objections - Generic]
  • November 03, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • September 30, 2020: [Quash]
  • September 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 29, 2020: [Quash]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 25, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 20, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 20, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.