U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01031
  • Case Name: Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc v. Navistar, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 17, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Motion with Access to Selected Parties]
  • October 15, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 15, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 20, 2020: [Seal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.