U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Graco Inc et al v. Smart Spray LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • January 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • January 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 11, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 11, 2020: [Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 22, 2020: [Answer to Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
  • October 22, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 05, 2020: [Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • August 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 21, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • August 20, 2020: [Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.