U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Welker v. Life Insurance Company of the Southwest
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • November 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 05, 2021: [Closing Documents]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 06, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Report]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 18, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 19, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 09, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • August 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 21, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.