U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03038
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Case Ready for Decision]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.