U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Kelley v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Remand Under Sentence 6]
  • November 03, 2020: [Remand Under Sentence 6 - Social Security]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.