U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00269
  • Case Name: Blodgett v. Dawson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 11, 2020: [TRO]
  • December 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • November 30, 2020: [TRO]
  • November 25, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 06, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.