U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Powell v. Blackstone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.