U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Leinen v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • December 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 26, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 26, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.