U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00270
  • Case Name: Nichols v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 16, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 27, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 27, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.