U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00271
  • Case Name: Krier v. Gibbs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 28, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.