U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Industrial Steel Construction, Inc. v. Lunda Construction Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 03, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2021: [Vacate]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 23, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 02, 2021: [Vacate]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 17, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2020: [Stay]
  • November 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 14, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 07, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 07, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 07, 2020: [Enforce IRS Summons]
  • October 07, 2020: [Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • October 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 05, 2020: [Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 23, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 18, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Stay]
  • August 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.