U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Frank, et al., v. Boston Scientific Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 20, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.