U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Arkeilpane v. ITA Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 16, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Closing Documents]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • September 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Certificate]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.