U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00279
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Wray
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2021
  • October 30, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • October 29, 2021: [Errata]
  • October 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 27, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 14, 2021: [In Limine]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 09, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.