U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Prichard v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • April 04, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 01, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • April 01, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Remand]
  • January 04, 2022: [Remand]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • July 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.