U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Skoog v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 04, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • September 04, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • September 03, 2020: [Certificate]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.