U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03043
  • Case Name: AW Dynamometer, Inc. v. Dyno Tech Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 05, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 05, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 02, 2020: [Set Aside Default Entry]
  • December 02, 2020: [Default Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Default Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.