U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00287
  • Case Name: Snider v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
  • May 06, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • February 10, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 25, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.