U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Reinbold et al v. Mississippi Valley Regional Blood Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • November 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 02, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 04, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.