U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00288
  • Case Name: Metcalf et al v. Cord King, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Stipulation]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Sealed Document]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 11, 2022: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 22, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.