U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Young v. City of Council Bluffs, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 27, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 01, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 27, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Substitute Party]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2021: [Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Substitute Party]
  • July 27, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Substitute Party]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Substitute Party]
  • February 12, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 08, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 20, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 24, 2020: [Substitute Party]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Removal By USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.