U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00291
  • Case Name: CHHALLIYIL v. FOODCHAIN ID GROUP, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 24, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 21, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 21, 2021: [Strike]
  • September 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 02, 2021: [Brief /Other]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 30, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 29, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 13, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 05, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • October 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 23, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.