U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00283
  • Case Name: Williams v. Ankeny Police Officers
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 10, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • October 06, 2020: [Letter]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 23, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.