U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Buckley v The Yankee Candle Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • November 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Leave]
October, 2020
  • October 12, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 05, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 22, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.