U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00060
  • Case Name: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Air Vents, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • October 19, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Expedite]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 16, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 09, 2021: [Compel]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of Time]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.