U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00295
  • Case Name: Brown v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Reconsideration]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Reconsideration]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 07, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.