U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Baldwin v. Iowa City Community School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 11, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 07, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • October 13, 2020: [Leave]
  • October 07, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 27, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.