U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02076
  • Case Name: Cortez v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Expedite]
  • September 02, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.