U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00296
  • Case Name: Contego Spa Designs, Inc. v. Stiletto LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • January 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 07, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 15, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2020: [Summons Issued]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 29, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 29, 2020: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • September 29, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 28, 2020: [Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.