U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00082
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Marsden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice - Other]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Default Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Default Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 18, 2021: [Default Entry by Clerk]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 28, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.