U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00301
  • Case Name: Blume v. Eyerly-Ball Community Mental Health Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 04, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 05, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • October 02, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 01, 2020: [Certificate]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.