U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00265
  • Case Name: Frazier v. Donner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.