U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00300
  • Case Name: Nguyen v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • June 11, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • June 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • March 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 25, 2021: [Bifurcate/Sever]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 20, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 02, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.