U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00303
  • Case Name: Hilson v. Weitzell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Errata]
  • November 18, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • November 17, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Brief /Other]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 21, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • September 14, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • August 20, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 02, 2021: [Stay]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 02, 2021: [Errata]
  • June 02, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 19, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 08, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • February 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 02, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.