U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00304
  • Case Name: Sawgrass Townhomes Owners Association, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 02, 2021: [Status Report Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2020: [Stay]
  • December 16, 2020: [Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Stay]
  • November 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 05, 2020: [Stay]
October, 2020
  • October 29, 2020: [Order]
  • October 29, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • October 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 15, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 14, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • October 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 05, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.