U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Pawlik v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • April 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Status Report]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • February 03, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 09, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 12, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.