U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. Iowa Department of Public Safety et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 15, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 10, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 05, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 06, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.