U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00308
  • Case Name: Still et al v. Freeman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 07, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.