U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00311
  • Case Name: Richards v. Kinkade et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Recusal]
  • February 17, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 17, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 17, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 17, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 17, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • February 05, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • February 03, 2021: [Leave]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 15, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Recusal]
  • December 21, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 21, 2020: [Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 18, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 16, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 16, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • November 16, 2020: [Leave]
  • November 10, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 26, 2020: [Errata]
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.