U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Adrian Trucking, Inc v. Navistar, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Quash]
  • December 17, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Seal]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 28, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 12, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 12, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.