U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01045
  • Case Name: Henderson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Remand]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Brief]
  • September 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 01, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.