U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Pozeck v. Menards, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Quash]
  • December 28, 2021: [Quash]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • December 15, 2021: [In Limine]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [In Limine]
  • November 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Default Entry]
  • October 01, 2021: [Default Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 13, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.