U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00314
  • Case Name: Garber v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 07, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order]
  • December 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • October 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.