U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00313
  • Case Name: Raynor v. Des Moines Area Community College et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2021: [Add Party]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Add Party]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.