U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Dickinson v. First Midwest Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Summons Issued]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2020: [Complaint]
  • October 14, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.