U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00316
  • Case Name: Miller v. Elliott Oil Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.